I Think I Know.
Yee Haw!
Yippy Skippy!
Potpourri
I got You Babe!
100

100

24 + 28 = 

ADD BY PLACE VALUE The tens are added together and the ones are added together. Then the tens and ones are added together to find the total sum (answer).

24 + 28 = 

Add Tens: 20 + 20 = 40

Add Ones: 4 + 8 = 12

Add Tens & Ones: 40 + 12 = 52

Add Tens & Ones: 40 + 12 = 52

100

ADD ONE NUMBER ON OR IN PARTS

24 + 28 = 

Add One Number On Using Place Value

28 + 20 = 48

48 + 4 = 52

28 48 52

100

Estimate to the nearest 10 to solve.

76+25=

80+30=110

100

What does a plant grow in math class?

What is a ...square root?

200

Two math books  complain to each other. What do they tell each other?

I have so many problems.

200

Solve by decomposing.

61+19=

60+1 +10+9

60+10=70

1+9=10

70+10=80

200

Use a double to solve this problem.

8+7=

How would you use a double to solve this problem?

8+7=

8+8=16

16-1=15

or

7+7=14

14+1=15

200

In which grade level do we focus on the combinations of 5.

kindergarten

200

BREAK APART BY PLACE VALUE

1,234 x 9 = 

Equations

Multiply Thousands: 1,000 x 9 = 9,000

Multiply Hundreds: 200 x 9 = 1,800

Multiply Tens: 30 x 9 = 270

Multiply Ones: 4 x 9 = 36

Add Products: 9,000 + 1,800 + 270 + 36 = 11,106

OR AREA MODEL

300

COMPENSATION

39 x 25 = 

39 x 25 = (40 x 25) - (1 x 25)

39 x 25 = 1,000 - 25

39 x 25 = 975

300

BUILDING UP GROUPS BY MULTIPLYING

2,512 ÷ 4 = 

4 x  = 2,512

4 x 500 = 2,000

4 x 100 = 400

4 x 25 = 100

4 x 3 = 12

500 + 100 + 25 + 3 = 628 4 x 628 = 2,512

300

39 x 25 = 

39 x 25 = (39 x 10) + (39 x 10) + (39 x 5)

39 x 10 = 390 39 x 10 = 390 39 x 5 = 195

975

300

Adding Up To     subtracting in Parts

925 - 674 =

925 - 600 = 325

325 - 20 = 305

305 - 50 = 255

255 - 4 = 251

674 + ___ = 925

674 + 1 = 675

675 + 200 = 875

875 + 50 = 925

1 + 200 + 50 = 251

300

Mr. Skip had 400 dirty rags.  He cleaned 379 of them.  How many dirty rags are left?

What is...21

400

Bobbi

400

Use expanded form to solve.

355+422=

What is

300 +50+5

400+20+2

300+400=700

50+20=70

5+2=7

777

500

This is the grade level which contains the standard algorithm for addition and subtraction.