Multiplication 1 digit by 3 digit

Multiplication 1 digit by 3 digit

Multiplication 1 digit by 4 digits

Multiplication 2 digit by 2 digit

Math Facts

Enter Category Name

100

3 x 454

1,362

100

9 x 1,235 =

11,115

100

13 x 62 =

806

100

7x7

49

100

How is this number said?

1,456

What is one thousand four hundred fifty-six

200

3 x 126 =

378

200

1,092 x 8

8,736

200

19 x 52 =

988

200

7 x 6

42

200

How is this number said?

28,611

What is twenty eight thousand six hundred eleven

300

9 x 876

7,884

300

1,990 x 2

3,980

300

34 x 38

1,292

300

8 x 9

72

300

How is this number said?

345,678

What is three hundred forty-five thousand six hundred seventy-eight

400

4 x 997

8,973

400

6 x 2,347 =

14,082

400

64 x 22

1,408

400

8 x 7

56

400

How is this number said?

780,450

What is seven hundred eighty thousand four hundred fifty

500

7 x 228

1,596

500

3 x 3,672

11,016

500

56 x 99

5,544

500

12 x 12

144

500

How is this number said?

2,365,978

What is two million three hundred sixty-five thousand nine hundred seventy-eight

Click to zoom