2 digits by 1 digit

2 digits by 1 digit

2 digits by 2 digits

3 digits by 2 digits

3 digits by 3 digits

Multiplication Facts

100

25 x 8 =

200
Two hundred

100

32 x 21

672

100

238 x 65 =

15,470
Fifteen thousand four hundred seventy

100

283 x 416

117,728

100

What is the answer to a multiplication problem.

What is product

200

91 x 9 =

819
Eight hundred nineteen

200

25 x 12

300

200

107 x 43

4,601

200

803 x 406

326,018

200

What is 1 ways to solve multiplication problems?

What is area model / standard algorithm

300

76 x 5 =

380
Three hundred eighty

300

73 x 68

4,964

300

612 x 39 =

23,868
Twenty-three thousand eight hundred sixty-eight

300

426 x 307

130,782

300

When multiplying and we move to the next place value , what is the next step?

What is filler zero?

400

97 x 8 =

776
Seven hundred seventy-six

400

98 x 97 =

9,506
Nine thousand five hundred six

400

976 x 816

15, 616

400

803 x 416

334,048

400

When using the area model , how are the numbers represented(displayed)?

What is expanded form?

500

98 x 43

4, 214

500

29 x 48

1,392

500

529 x 48

25,392

500

254 x 104

26,416

500

What are the numbers called being multiplied together?

What is factors?

Click to zoom